U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00289
  • Case Name: Stewart v. Love Tender Care Home Care LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Default Entry 55(a)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.