U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Arroyo-Castro v. Gasper et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 24, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2025: [Order]
  • March 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.