U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Hunt v. Town of Manchester et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.