U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Loris v. Sequeira et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.