U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01098
  • Case Name: Ramos v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.