U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01790
  • Case Name: Petitpas v. Brayfield et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 16, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.