U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01258
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Dwyer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Default Entry 55(a)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 16, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.