U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01962
  • Case Name: Velazquez v. St. Vincent's Special Needs Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.