U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-01324
  • Case Name: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company v. BioHealth Laboratories, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Special Master ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.