U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Clear Wave Delivery Systems LLC v. PBIRx, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 19, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.