U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Bergeson v. City of New London et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 27, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.