U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Evans v. First Student, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 19, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.