U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01998
  • Case Name: Oppenheimer v. AI Engineers, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.