U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00266
  • Case Name: O'Brien v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
  • April 21, 2025: [Social Security Transcripts]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Recommended Ruling]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.