U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01358
  • Case Name: White et al v. Kautilya Plainfield Hotel LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Consent and Transfer to Jurisdiction by USMJ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.