U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01461
  • Case Name: Wallace v. Wesleyan University
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.