U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00230
  • Case Name: Kolonziaa et al v. Allied Community Resources, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 01, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.