U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Henrique v. Toyota Motor Credit Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • March 31, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.