U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Lahey v. Bubar et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Conference]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.