U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30024
  • Case Name: Fred V Parcesepe and April M Parcesepe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Scheduling Order/Pretrial Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.