U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Clark v. Linde Advanced Material Technologies, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Substitute Party]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.