U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30250
  • Case Name: Brooke C. Geller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Dismiss Case]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement of Intent]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Schedules AB-J]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.