U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30019
  • Case Name: Wayne M. Wyman, Jr. and Victoria A. Wyman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.