U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50255
  • Case Name: Alexander Gregory Cap
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice Re: Trustees Final Report and Final Account]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Filing Fee Paid in Full]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.