U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00510
  • Case Name: Eccleston v. Brown Paindiris & Scott, LLP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.