U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00506
  • Case Name: Beck v. Dudek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance - Commissioner]
  • April 02, 2025: [SSA Cases - Notice of New Action]
  • April 02, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: [SSA Cases - Notice to Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [SSA Cases - Standing Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [SSA Cases - Standing Order re: Assignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.