U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-31069
  • Case Name: Allan A. Gesa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Worksheet]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement Regarding Chapter 13 Plan Ready for Confirmation]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.