U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-31116
  • Case Name: Jose A. Martinez and Dismayra Martinez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Scheduling Order/Pretrial Order]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Response - Miscellaneous]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Worksheet]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement Regarding Chapter 13 Plan Ready for Confirmation]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.