U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20348
  • Case Name: Jeanne M. Szewczak
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Change of Mailing Address]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement of Intent]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Schedules AB-J]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.