U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00632
  • Case Name: Taylor-Austin v. Yale New Haven Health Services Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.