open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:15-cv-01075
    Party Name:Walker v. United States of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Amended]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47103
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =