U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz - Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 27, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 29, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Appoint Expert]
  • April 18, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • April 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 03, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: [Letter]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 14, 2019: [Interpreter Requested]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 17, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.