U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carasquillo-Vasquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 26, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 17, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 29, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 28, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.