U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • September 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 12, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • September 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 02, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.