U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • May 27, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • May 21, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 13, 2020: [Remark]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • October 15, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 16, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 06, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.