U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01330
  • Case Name: Sargent v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 17, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.