U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-22464-
  • Case Name: Eric Clinkscales
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 13]]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (F/A)]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Order Discharging Debtor [Ch 13]]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Compliance, Motion for Discharge and Notice of Deadline to Object]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Financial Management Course (ADI)]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Requirement to File Local Form LF-97]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Change of Address (Non-Attorney)]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Substitute Attorney Order]
  • August 25, 2016: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Change of Address (Attorney)]
  • January 12, 2016: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • January 11, 2016: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Vacate Order]
December, 2015
  • December 19, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 17, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 17, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Trustee's Request for Order Confirming Plan [PAPERLESS]]
  • December 08, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • December 03, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 03, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Hearing by Filer]
  • December 03, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Vacate]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Value and Determine Secured Status of Lien on Personal Property Order]
  • November 18, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
  • November 17, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Requirement to File a Certificate of Completion of a Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.