open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:9:20-cv-80220
    Party Name:Poschmann v. Delray Beach Associates, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Scheduling Mediation]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Requirements]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?566386
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =