open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

FLORIDA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:20-bk-02368-
    Party Name:Austin J Harris and Lauren E Harris
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice of Change of Address - Debtor]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Summary of Assets]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement of Current Monthly Income / Calculation of Disposable Income - Ch 13 (B122C-1 / B22C-2)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 13]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Administrative Order FLMB-2018-2 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1313731
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =