U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-20176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lyle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Striking]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Standing Discovery Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arraignment (Select as last hrg for OPT WVR/DPPA/SDO)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.