U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-01455-
  • Case Name: John R Jenerou, Jr. and Kelly J Jenerou
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Summary of Assets]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement of Current Monthly Income / Calculation of Disposable Income - Ch 13 (B122C-1 / B22C-2)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Certificate Of Service (BK)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Request for Notice]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Order Extending Automatic Stay & Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Certificate Of Service (BK)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [AJTA - Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [ADI - Administrative Order FLMB-2018-2 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neway, Douglas W [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.