U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-00204-
  • Case Name: Michelle Dawnn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing (BK)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Order on Application to Employ/Retain]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Notice Fixing Time to File Proofs of Claim - 90/75/other days]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Assets]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Application to Employ/Retain]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Discharge of Debtor - Ch. 7 - TAMPA/ORLANDO/JAX]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.