open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00066-1
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HILL
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standard Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:May 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:April 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:April 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:February 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 13, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
    Date Published:September 24, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Federal Defender]
    Date Published:August 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 27, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85873
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =