open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00071-2
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MILLER
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order of Transfer/Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standard Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:March 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:October 22, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence i/c/w Fair Sentencing Act of 2010]
    Date Published:August 27, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?89718
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =