open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:5:14-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GRANT
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Answer]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:May 22, 2014
  • Filing Type:[CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85789
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =