open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:5:18-cv-00320
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Consent]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:October 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Rules 16/26]
    Date Published:June 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Lifting Stay]
    Date Published:June 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:June 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:May 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:May 13, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?88650
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =