open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:5:12-cv-00026
    Party Name:SMITH v. OWENS
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Intervene]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Produce State Prisoner]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Rules 16/26]
    Date Published:July 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85907
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =