open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-30934
    Party Name:Gail D. Giles
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:January 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case (Other) (batch)(Trustee)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Response With Opposition]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Payroll Deduction (Amended)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Fees Paid (Misc.)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Termination or Absence of Stay]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Impose Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Expediting Hearing]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Installment Payment]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342495
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =