open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-10528
    Party Name:Valiere J. Leven
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holland, Ray [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holland, Ray [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holland, Ray [Avoid Lien for Non-PMSI Pursuant to 522(f)(1)(B)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holland, Ray [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holland, Ray [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Approve Agreement]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Approval of Agreement]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held - Trustee's Motion to Dismiss - WD]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Employ]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmable JDW]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:May 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?334169
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =