open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-11507
    Party Name:Sondra Leigh Swaynos
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Default on Motion (Dismiss)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 23, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?330147
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =